+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {816683/1 Report Adopted
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
816683/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 16, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor