+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (66)
On April 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 63
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Floor Amendment {709333/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {123525/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {313621/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
- Floor Committee Amendment {373829/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment {283220/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted
- Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (125-3)
- Text - Enrolled - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment (#51) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments
- Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#8-9) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#10-12) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#13-16) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#17-50) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#105) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#52-54) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#55) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#56-100) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#101) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#102-104) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#106-126) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#127) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#128) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Adopted
- Floor Committee Amendment {883823/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report - Senate - Committee Report - Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments
- Reprint - Senate - Committee Reprint - Budget and Taxation
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
- Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation Adopted
- Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted
- Referred Rules
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-2)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#7-11) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
- Favorable with Amendments
- Reprint - House - Committee Reprint - Appropriations
- Report - House - Committee Report - Appropriations
- Committee Amendment (#18-22) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#12-17) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#32-38) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#23-26) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#27-31) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#39-41) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#42-105) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#106-107) Adopted
- Committee Amendment (#108-124) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Text - Third - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2021, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, and 2020
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020 - Article - Chapter of the Acts
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2021: Third Reading Passed (125-3)
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 3
April 2, 2021: Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 25, 2021: Third Reading Passed (129-2)
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 2
March 24, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 20, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor