+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-1)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {342316/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
342316/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 13, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor