+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (84-54)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {323925/1 Rejected (51-83)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Committee Amendment {713294/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Davis) {713723/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {613426/1 Rejected (53-83)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {973026/1 Rejected (51-83)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {643426/1 Rejected (50-82)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {863928/1 Rejected (52-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {783522/1 Rejected (52-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {153322/1 Rejected (50-79)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {653328/1 Rejected (50-77)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {233899/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (10)
March 31, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 29, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 54
March 28, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kipke) {323925/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 83
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {973026/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 83
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {863928/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 81
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Morgan) {653328/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 77
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (O'Donnell) {643426/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 82
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {153322/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 79
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Carozza) {783522/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 81
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Bromwell) {613426/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 83
+ − Sponsors (81)
Type:
Primary Sponsor