+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kramer) Adopted (23-20)
- Favorable
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Cecil County - Snare Traps - Repeal of Prohibitions
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {510214/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Snare Traps - Prohibition Against Sale or Possession - Alterations
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-410 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kramer) Adopted (23-20)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 20
March 20, 2021: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
January 26, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor