+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {304235/1 Report Adopted
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {914060/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-601 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
April 4, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46