+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 640716/1 Report Adopted
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
640716/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 11, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 11, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor