+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {173092/1 Adopted
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
- Text - First - Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-102, 13-904 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 16, 2021: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
January 20, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor