+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {154632/1 Report Adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
154632/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor