+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Text - Third - Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {213928/1 Adopted
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-910 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Yeas: 135
February 2, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor