+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-8)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order until later this session (Delegate Jones) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
- Floor Amendment 103722/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 434369/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 4, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 29, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 26, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor