+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 15, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor