+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-0)
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {563324/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {633799/1 Adopted
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-102, 11-1701, 11-1702 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- Yeas: 130
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (43-0)
- Yeas: 43
February 3, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor