+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (33-14)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Finance
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (101-38)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 25, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 24, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
March 7, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 38
March 4, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor