+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-6)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {796588/2 Report Adopted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
796588/02
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 19, 2013: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 18, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor