+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-301 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 12, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 9, 2015: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor