+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (122-9)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 20-706, 20-807 - Article - Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 4, 2021: Third Reading Passed (122-9)
- Yeas: 122
- Nays: 9
February 26, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 29, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor