+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 11, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 11, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor