+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (93-42)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {675865/1 Adopted
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Prohibited Conduct
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-1508 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (93-42)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 42
January 21, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor