+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {244738/1 Report Adopted
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {506889/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 18-338.2 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
March 30, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 7, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor