+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled -
- Passed Enrolled
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Conference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (107-25)
- Conference Committee Report {443927/1 Adopted
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis)
- Senate Refuses Recede
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Kagan and Ellis)
- Senate Refuses Recede
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell)
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Healey, Harrison and Wivell)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {614136/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (114-21)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-1101, 1-1102, 1-1103 through 1-1105 - Article - Local Government
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
April 6, 2021: Third Reading Passed (107-25)
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 25
March 18, 2021: Third Reading Passed (114-21)
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 21
January 19, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor