+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
- Favorable with Amendments 414167/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
414167/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-1220 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 15, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 13, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor