+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Education - Student Athletes - Uniform Modifications for Modesty (Inclusive Athletic Attire Act)
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (112-27)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Education - Student Athletes - Uniform Modifications for Modesty (Inclusive Athletic Attire Act)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {683829/1 Adopted
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Education - Student Athletes - Uniform Modifications for Modesty (Inclusive Athletic Attire Act)
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-134, 16-110, 7-129 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 10, 2022: Third Reading Passed (112-27)
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 27
February 2, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor