+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {740110/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendment
740110/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2013: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 18, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor