+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (95-45)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {127272/1 Report Adopted
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (92-46)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {313924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-87)
- Floor Amendment {513429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {513429/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {943995/1 Report Adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-211 - Article - Public Utilities
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 45
March 27, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 25, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 14
February 24, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {313924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 87
February 20, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor