+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - University of Maryland - Institute for Public Leadership - Establishment
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (40-6)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (101-34)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Floor Amendment {913225/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-92)
- Text - Third - University of Maryland - Institute for Public Leadership - Establishment
- Floor Amendment {543625/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {223529/1 Adopted
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 30, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - University of Maryland - Institute for Public Leadership - Establishment
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-105 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (7)
March 31, 2022: Third Reading Passed (40-6)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 6
March 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (101-34)
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 34
March 16, 2022: Floor Amendment {913225/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-92)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 92
March 16, 2022: Floor Amendment {543625/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 95