+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 25, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 16, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
February 13, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor