+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {440615/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
440615/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 24-206 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 23, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 21, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139