+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (111-26)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {460111/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
+ − Amendment
460111/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-309 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 11, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 26
March 7, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 7, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor