+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-406 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 19, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 16, 2015: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor