+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {803221/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {476480/1 Report Adopted
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On September 15, 2015 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 1, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor