+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-7)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-701 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 7
March 14, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor