+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {226682/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
226682/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 15-124 - Article - Health - General
- 15-701 - Article - Health - General
- 19-214 - Article - Health - General
- 14-106 - Article - Insurance
- 14-106.2 - Article - Insurance
- 14-107 - Article - Insurance
- 14-501 through 14-509 - Article - Insurance
- 14-510 through 14-515 - Article - Insurance
- 31-107 - Article - Insurance
- 31-117 - Article - Insurance
- 6-101 - Article - Insurance
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor