+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {326682/1 Report Adopted
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
326682/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-10A-05 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 21, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
February 18, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor