+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (112-20)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {616785/1 Report Adopted
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
616785/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 28, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 20
February 25, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor