+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Pre-filed