+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {152214/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
152214/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 22, 2013: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 21, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor