+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-101 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Vote
April 5, 2013: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor