+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {416486/1 Report Adopted
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
416486/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 4, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 1, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor