+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {113891/1 Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On July 27, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
113891/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 9, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor