+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (29-18)
- Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Ready) Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (45-2)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (87-47)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {273527/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (46-86)
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {923597/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 17-602 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (6)
April 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 18
March 18, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 18, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 16, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 47
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {273527/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 86
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor