+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-1)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {700517/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
700517/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (41)
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor