+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-2)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {165263/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
+ − Amendment
165263/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 11-204.7 - Article - Agriculture
- 8-303 - Article - Business Regulation
- 8-308 - Article - Business Regulation
- 7-202 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
- 18-1504 - Article - Education
- 2-1002 - Article - Environment
- 5-203.1 - Article - Environment
- 4-217 - Article - Health - General
- 3-302 - Article - Natural Resources
- 4-604 - Article - Natural Resources
- 4-745 - Article - Natural Resources
- 5-117.1 - Article - Public Safety
- 7-203 - Article - Public Utilities
- 9-20B-05 - Article - State Government
- 13-613 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 19, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 19, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (50)
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor