+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Statute Amended
- 18-110 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2020: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
January 28, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor