+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-12)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {365468/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
365468/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 15, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor