+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {263020/1 Adopted
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - State Board of Cosmetology - Licensees - Supervision of Apprentices
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-404 - Article - Business Occupations and Professions
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
February 14, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
January 27, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor