+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (34-11)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (89-43)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 402517/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary and Appropriations)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
402517/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2018: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 3, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 11
March 19, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 19, 2018: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 16, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 43
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor