+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {508071/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendment
508071/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-816 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 26, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
March 22, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 3, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor