+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Finance
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 2018 - Article - Chapter of the Acts
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2020: Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- Yeas: 131
January 14, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor