+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 734
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-1)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-420 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 30, 2017: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 10, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor